WA SB6287 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 1/1/2022*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning guardianships and conservatorships.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning guardianships and conservatorships.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-02SenateEffective date 1/1/2022*.
2020-04-02SenateChapter 312, 2020 Laws.
2020-04-02SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-12SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-11SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-09SenatePassed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-09SenateSenate concurred in House amendments.
2020-03-05HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-05HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-05HouseCommittee amendment
2020-03-04HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseMinority; do not pass.
2020-03-02HouseAPP - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-03-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-28HouseCRJ - Majority; do pass with amendment
2020-02-28HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-26HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-21HouseFirst reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
2020-02-18SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-02-18SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-18SenateFloor amendment
2020-02-18Senate1st substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-01-31SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-30SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-01-30SenateLAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-30SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-27SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Law & Justice.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6287&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6287.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6287-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6287-S.E.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6287-S.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6287-S.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121197&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-18-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6287&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121197&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-05-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6287&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121197&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=03-09-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6287&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback