WA SB6289 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the restoration of the right to possess a firearm.
Title
Concerning the restoration of the right to possess a firearm.
Sponsors
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] |
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |