WA SB6293 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-29 - Effective date 6/9/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Addressing student volunteers.
Title
Addressing student volunteers.
Sponsors
Sen. John Braun [R] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | Effective date 6/9/2016. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 62, 2016 Laws. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2016-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2016-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-03-04 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-03-04 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-25 | House | LAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2016-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 9:00 AM. |
2016-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2016-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2016-02-16 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |