WA SB6295 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning false reporting of a crime or emergency.
Title
Concerning false reporting of a crime or emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Jesse Salomon [D] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2632 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6295&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6295.pdf |