WA SB6297 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the experience of existing early learning providers to meet educational requirements.
Title
Recognizing the experience of existing early learning providers to meet educational requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Lisa Wellman [D] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-26 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing scheduled, but not heard in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |