WA SB6301 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the designation of urban growth areas outside the hundred year floodplain by counties.
Title
Concerning the designation of urban growth areas outside the hundred year floodplain by counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-11 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-12 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |