WA SB6301 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating awarding of costs, including attorneys' fees, in actions challenging actions taken by professional peer review bodies.
Title
Regulating awarding of costs, including attorneys' fees, in actions challenging actions taken by professional peer review bodies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-17 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2308 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-29 - Effective date 3/29/2012.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6301&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6301.pdf |