WA SB6309 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding access to nutritious food.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding access to nutritious food.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateEffective date 6/11/2020.
2020-03-18SenateChapter 68, 2020 Laws.
2020-03-18SenateGovernor signed.
2020-03-09SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-05HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-05SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-04HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
2020-03-04HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-03-03HousePlaced on second reading.
2020-03-03HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-03-02HouseAPP - Majority; do pass.
2020-03-02HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-29HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
2020-02-28HouseReferred to Appropriations.
2020-02-25HouseHSEL - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-25HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.
2020-02-21HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 8:00 AM.
2020-02-17HouseFirst reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning.
2020-02-14SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3.
2020-02-14SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-14Senate2nd substitute bill substituted
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-11SenateWM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-01-28SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-01-28SenateHSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-01-28SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-22SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation.

Same As/Similar To

HB2262 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-14 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6309&Year=2019&Initiative=false
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6309.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6309-S.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6309-S2.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Passed Legislature/6309-S2.PL.pdf
Texthttp://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Session Laws/Senate/6309-S2.SL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121219&chamber=Senate&actionHistoryDate=02-14-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6309&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20
Roll Callhttps://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary/rollcall/vote?legId=121219&chamber=House&actionHistoryDate=03-04-2020&indexOnDayByChamber=1&billNumber=6309&isInit=False&biennium=2019-20

Bill Comments

feedback