WA SB6313 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing opportunities for young voters.
Title
Increasing opportunities for young voters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 27 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 208, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 27; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass without amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-21 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-21 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-21 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill not substituted. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Held on calendar. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2558 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.