WA SB6316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the consideration of the number of citations for traffic infractions issued by a law enforcement officer in the performance review of the officer.
Title
Prohibiting the consideration of the number of citations for traffic infractions issued by a law enforcement officer in the performance review of the officer.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-25 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |