WA SB6319 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning administration of the senior property tax exemption program.
Title
Concerning administration of the senior property tax exemption program.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 209, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - First reading, referred to Finance.