WA SB6326 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning municipal conflicts of interest.
Title
Concerning municipal conflicts of interest.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 69, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Local Government. |