WA SB6328 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a local infrastructure investment program to support the development of affordable housing, workforce housing, and revitalization efforts.
Title
Creating a local infrastructure investment program to support the development of affordable housing, workforce housing, and revitalization efforts.
Sponsors
Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Brad Hawkins [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Sen. Phil Fortunato [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |