WA SB6331 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning captive insurers.
Title
Concerning captive insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-09 | House | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-03-07 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | FIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 9:30 AM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2493 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.