WA SB6334 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-25 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the sales of growlers of wine or beer.
Title
Concerning the sales of growlers of wine or beer.
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Keiser [D] | Sen. Michael Hewitt [R] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2327 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-15 - First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight