WA SB6340 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Preserving the ability of auto dealers to offer consumers products not supplied by an auto manufacturer.
Title
Preserving the ability of auto dealers to offer consumers products not supplied by an auto manufacturer.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Mark Mullet [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2374 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.