WA SB6346 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing tribal representation on the emergency management council.
Title
Establishing tribal representation on the emergency management council.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2680 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6346&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6346.pdf |