WA SB6351 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning working connections child care eligibility.
Title
Concerning working connections child care eligibility.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] |
Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2456 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-02 - Effective date 7/1/2020.