WA SB6354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing enhanced payment to low volume, small rural hospitals.
Title
Providing enhanced payment to low volume, small rural hospitals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2729 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-30 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.