WA SB6355 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the contributions of the state's forest products sector as part of the state's global climate response.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the contributions of the state's forest products sector as part of the state's global climate response.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2020-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-11SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-11SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-11SenateWM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.
2020-02-11SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-10SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Ways & Means.
2020-02-06SenateAnd refer to Ways & Means.
2020-02-06SenateAWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-06SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-28SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-15SenateFirst reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks.

Same As/Similar To

HB2528 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 6/11/2020.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback