WA SB6356 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring training on human trafficking.
Title
Requiring training on human trafficking.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Padden [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Jeff Holy [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] |
Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Keith Wagoner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2320 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-12 - Returned to House Rules 3.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6356&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6356.pdf |