WA SB6358 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring medicaid managed care organizations to provide reimbursement of health care services provided by substitute providers.
Title
Requiring medicaid managed care organizations to provide reimbursement of health care services provided by substitute providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-29 | House | APP - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2598 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-16 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.