WA SB6361 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the administration of election campaign activities and reporting statements of financial affairs.
Title
Concerning the administration of election campaign activities and reporting statements of financial affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2674 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-17 - First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.