WA SB6366 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-20 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting a sale or transfer of real property for affordable housing to a nonprofit entity, housing authority, or public corporation from the real estate excise tax.
Title
Exempting a sale or transfer of real property for affordable housing to a nonprofit entity, housing authority, or public corporation from the real estate excise tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Mullet [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | HSA - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2634 (Crossfiled) 2020-04-03 - Governor vetoed.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6366&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6366.pdf |