WA SB6371 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding school library information and technology programs.
Title
Expanding school library information and technology programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] |
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Lynda Wilson [R] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2637 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM.