WA SB6378 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning residential tenant protections.
Title
Concerning residential tenant protections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 315, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 42; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | HSA - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing Stability & Affordability at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing Stability & Affordability. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2724 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-20 - First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.