WA SB6385 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for jobs training for homeless individuals.
Title
Providing for jobs training for homeless individuals.
Sponsors
Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
Sen. Liz Lovelett [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |