WA SB6392 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-27 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a local wine industry association license.
Title
Creating a local wine industry association license.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-27 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Chapter 210, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-20 | House | COG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-20 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-14 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 12:00 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2683 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.