WA SB6394 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing sports wagering subject to the terms of tribal-state gaming compacts.
Title
Authorizing sports wagering subject to the terms of tribal-state gaming compacts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2638 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Effective date 3/25/2020.