WA SB6408 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning agency responsibilities to regulated businesses and professions.
Title
Concerning agency responsibilities to regulated businesses and professions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-27 | House | SGOV - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | FIET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 9:00 AM. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | And refer to Financial Institutions, Economic Development & Trade. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2577 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.