WA SB6418 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the definition of period of war for pensions.
Title
Concerning the definition of period of war for pensions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2655 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-23 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 3:30 PM.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6418&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6418.pdf |