WA SB6429 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 1/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 31 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-31 - Effective date 1/1/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a designation on a driver's license or identicard that a person has a developmental disability.
Title
Providing a designation on a driver's license or identicard that a person has a developmental disability.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Brown [R] | Sen. Maureen Walsh [R] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] |
Sen. Kevin Van De Wege [D] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-31 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2022. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Chapter 261, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2463 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.