WA SB6432 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning offshore oil extraction.
Title
Concerning offshore oil extraction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 12; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2020-02-17 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |