WA SB6435 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Ordering mandatory restitution for sexual exploitation of children.
Title
Ordering mandatory restitution for sexual exploitation of children.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve O'Ban [R] | Sen. Jeanne Kohl-Welles [D] | Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. Daniel Kline [D] |
Sen. Jan Angel [R] | Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Maralyn Chase [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 5:30 PM. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |