WA SB6436 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Effective date 6/12/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a work group to make recommendations for the continued viability of the college bound scholarship program.
Title
Creating a work group to make recommendations for the continued viability of the college bound scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2014. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Chapter 215, 2014 Laws. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2014-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2014-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2014-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2014-03-03 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-27 | House | APPE - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2014-02-27 | House | APPE - Executive action taken by committee. |
2014-02-27 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on Education at 10:00 AM. |
2014-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Education |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2014-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | HIE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |