WA SB6443 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Referred to Ways & Means.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning convictions for offenses that were committed at age sixteen or seventeen and placed in exclusive jurisdiction of the juvenile court in 2018.
Title
Concerning convictions for offenses that were committed at age sixteen or seventeen and placed in exclusive jurisdiction of the juvenile court in 2018.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2795 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.