WA SB6447 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a coprescription of opioid overdose reversal medication.
Title
Requiring a coprescription of opioid overdose reversal medication.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] | Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] |
Sen. Emily Randall [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | BH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Behavioral Health Subcommittee to Health & Long Term Care. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2337 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.