WA SB6451 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the installation of residential fire sprinkler systems.
Title
Concerning the installation of residential fire sprinkler systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-02-26 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2010-02-13 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-02-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-01 | GO - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-01-28 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-14 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. |