WA SB6451 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying certain provisions regarding transportation benefit districts.
Title
Modifying certain provisions regarding transportation benefit districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-02-22 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2012-02-14 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-03 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-02 | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-02-01 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-01-31 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2012-01-24 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2659 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.