WA SB6451 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the school construction assistance program.
Title
Concerning the school construction assistance program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2014-02-07 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 5:30 PM. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |