WA SB6455 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring default beverages for children's meals.
Title
Requiring default beverages for children's meals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | LG - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-28 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-16 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:30 AM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2383 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-21 - Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.