WA SB6464 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state building code council membership.
Title
Concerning state building code council membership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | LGOV - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Local Government. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | And refer to Local Government. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | SGTE - Majority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. |