WA SB6468 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the legislative advisory committee to the committee on advanced tuition payment.
Title
Repealing the legislative advisory committee to the committee on advanced tuition payment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-26 | House | CWD - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on College & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-06 | House | First reading, referred to College & Workforce Development. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | HEWD - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education & Workforce Development at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education & Workforce Development. |