WA SB6478 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revising economic assistance programs.
Title
Revising economic assistance programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Jeannie Darneille [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] |
Sen. Manka Dhingra [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020*. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 320, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2020-03-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-11 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-11 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2020-03-11 | House | Rules suspended. |
2020-03-11 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2020-03-06 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-06 | House | Floor amendment |
2020-03-06 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | APP - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2020-02-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-26 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2020-02-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-25 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-21 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-18 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | HSRR - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Reentry & Rehabilitation. |