WA SB6483 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-02 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning rating requirements for child care providers.
Title
Concerning rating requirements for child care providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-02 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Chapter 321, 2020 Laws. |
2020-04-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-02 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-02-27 | House | HSEL - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services & Early Learning at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-24 | House | First reading, referred to Human Services & Early Learning. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |