WA SB6486 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding medicaid coverage for individuals with a rare disease.
Title
Expanding medicaid coverage for individuals with a rare disease.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | HLTC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care. |