WA SB6493 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Effective date 6/11/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the Cooper Jones active transportation safety council.
Title
Concerning the Cooper Jones active transportation safety council.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Curtis King [R] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] | Sen. Andrew Billig [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2020. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Chapter 72, 2020 Laws. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2020-03-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2020-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-03-02 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:00 AM. |
2020-02-19 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |