WA SB6497 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making supplemental transportation appropriations for the 2019-2021 fiscal biennium.
Title
Making supplemental transportation appropriations for the 2019-2021 fiscal biennium.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2322 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-31 - Effective date 3/31/2020.