WA SB6505 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding access to dual credit opportunities by eliminating direct costs to students and families.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding access to dual credit opportunities by eliminating direct costs to students and families.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateSenate Rules "X" file.
2020-02-17SenatePlaced on second reading by Rules Committee.
2020-02-07SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-02-07SenateMinority; without recommendation.
2020-02-07SenateEDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
2020-02-07SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-31SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-20SenateFirst reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback