WA SB6511 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing equitable educational outcomes for foster care and homeless children and youth from prekindergarten to postsecondary education.
Title
Increasing equitable educational outcomes for foster care and homeless children and youth from prekindergarten to postsecondary education.
Sponsors
Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] | Sen. Samuel Hunt [D] | Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2711 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-31 - Effective date 6/11/2020.